MD HB848 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain prohibition on a consumer bringing a certain action or proceeding against a consumer reporting agency; altering the manner in which a consumer may place, temporarily lift, or remove a security freeze; requiring a consumer reporting agency to develop certain procedures involving the use of certain secure connections to receive and process certain requests; authorizing a consumer reporting agency to develop certain electronic methods; establishing the Nondepository Special Fund for certain purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consumer Reporting Agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 480
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {167878/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {763798/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-16HouseHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0848&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0848f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0848t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0848e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_480_hb0848e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0848_76379801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0848_16787801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0848.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0848_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0598.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0848_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1046.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1331.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback