MD HB848 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from causing a diesel-powered motor vehicle to emit clearly visible smoke, soot, or other exhaust emissions onto another person or motor vehicle; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Shane Pendergrass [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (101-34) (Y: 101 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-34) |
2016-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {333423/1 Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {210619/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Construction
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Towing
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Towing
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections