MD HB847 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting victims of human trafficking from paying a specified out-of-county fee or out-of-region fee at community colleges in the State; authorizing each board of community college trustees to waive a specified out-of-county fee or out-of-region fee for students who are not residents of the county and are victims of human trafficking; requiring a community college to collect specified information and report to the Commission each year; requiring the Commission to submit a specified annual report to the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Community Colleges - Victims of Human Trafficking - Exemption From Out-of-County and Out-of-Region Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 341 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {145564/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-19 | House | Reassigned to Ways and Means |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Counties
Evidence
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Human Rights
Nonresidents
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Tuition
Victims
Community Colleges
Counties
Evidence
Fees
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Human Rights
Nonresidents
Privacy
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Tuition
Victims