MD HB842 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring hotel rental tax revenue in Calvert County to be distributed to the Tourism Development Incentive Fund; and requiring funds in the Tourism Development Incentive Fund to be distributed to the general fund of the county, certain municipalities, and as grants to certain businesses and organization for the fees required to hold special events and to market Calvert County to potential visitors.
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {723827/1 Adopted |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Calvert County
Grants
Hotels and Motels
Local Government Mandates
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Tourism
Grants
Hotels and Motels
Local Government Mandates
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 20 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 20 | 415.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |