MD HB842 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county or a municipal corporation to exempt from the admissions and amusement tax gross receipts from any charge for admission to participate in a State public school field trip or similar state public school activity.
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {885568/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |