MD HB84 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 4 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before January 1, 2025, each hospital and urgent care center in the State to implement an evidence-based protocol for the early recognition and treatment of a patient with sepsis, severe sepsis, or septic shock that is based on generally acceptable standards of care; requiring a specialty psychiatric hospital to establish a certain process; and requiring hospitals and urgent care centers to require periodic training in the implementation of the protocol for certain staff.
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2024-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {653427/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2023-07-27 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB332 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-28 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Job Training
Laboratories
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Time
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospitals
Job Training
Laboratories
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 310.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |