MD HB84 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding the purpose and use of the Maryland Farms and Families Fund to include grants to nonprofit farmers markets and local nonprofit organizations; authorizing the Department of Agriculture, when awarding grants, to consider a nonprofit organization's record of providing services in food deserts; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a $100,000 appropriation to the Fund which is in addition to, and may not supplant, any funding appropriated to a certain division in the Department; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Farms and Families Fund - Purpose, Use, Funding, and Grant Qualifications - Alterations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-6) (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 574
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {717279/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (134-6)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {424267/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-21HouseReassigned to Appropriations
2019-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0084&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0084f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0084t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0084e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_574_hb0084e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0084_42426701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0084_71727901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0084.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0084_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0131.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0084_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0084_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1013.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1200.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback