MD HB84 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a caption or catchline accompanying a section or subsection of law is to be interpreted in a specified manner unless otherwise provided by law.
Title
Annotated Code of Maryland - Captions and Catchlines - Interpretation
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2015-02-20 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |