MD HB839 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles have green pavement markings; requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for purposes of complying with specified zoning or parking laws; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-18 - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (114-19) (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-21HouseThird Reading Passed (114-19)
2016-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {850318/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback