MD HB839 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, by September 1, 2016, that a policy on sexual assault adopted by the governing board of each institution of higher education include a specified affirmative consent standard; requiring a specified written policy on sexual assault to include a specified standard and specified statements; requiring a specified sexual assault policy to provide that specified circumstances negate a valid excuse to an alleged lack of affirmative consent; etc.
Title
Education - Institutions of Higher Learning - Affirmative Consent Standard
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Community Colleges
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Evidence
Health
Higher Education
Mental Health
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Community Colleges
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Drugs
Evidence
Health
Higher Education
Mental Health
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse