MD HB837 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allocating specified motor fuel tax revenue to a specified account that is shared with local governments; increasing the portion of highway user revenue that is distributed to local governments; altering the allocation of the local share of highway user revenue among Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities; proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution mandating that revenue be credited to a specified account and distributed from that account in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsors
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Jason Buckel [R] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Del. Bob Long [R] | Del. Ric Metzgar [R] | Del. Matt Morgan [R] | Del. Haven Shoemaker [R] |
Del. Brett Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Constitutional Amendments
Counties
Fuel Tax
Municipal Corporations
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
State Aid
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Baltimore City
Constitutional Amendments
Counties
Fuel Tax
Municipal Corporations
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Sales and Use Tax
State Aid
Transportation
Transportation - Generally