MD HB837 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a specified exception to an exemption from execution on a judgment by establishing that 25% of the net recovery by a debtor on a claim for personal injury is subject to execution on a judgment for child support arrearage; and defining "net recovery."
Title
Courts - Exemption from Execution - Exception for Child Support Arrearage
Sponsors
Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. John Cluster [R] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] |
Del. Ronald George [R] | Del. Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio [D] | Del. Michael Smigiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Senators Ramirez, Gladden, and Getty | |
2011-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-18 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-18 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-09 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Delegates Dumais, Alston, and McComas | |
2011-04-06 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-06 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2011-04-06 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-10 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Judiciary |