MD HB836 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements for an automated external defibrillator program in public middle and high schools; altering the requirements for actions to be taken by county boards of education regarding heat acclimatization for student athletes; requiring middle schools and high schools to develop venue-specific emergency action plans for the operation and use of automatic external defibrillators, heat acclimatization, and coordination of care for other emergent injuries and severe weather for outdoor facilities; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Student Athletics - Requirements and Emergency Action Plans (Elijah Gorham Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 203223/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 83 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Floor Amendment 203223/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 83 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-3) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {213326/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-9) |
2022-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-17 | House | Floor Amendment {203223/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (42-83) |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733822/1 Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-08 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB638 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-11 - Third Reading Passed (129-4)
Subjects
Age
Certifications
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Heating and Cooling
Injury
Job Training
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
Students
Water
Weather
Certifications
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Heating and Cooling
Injury
Job Training
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Sports and Recreation
Students
Water
Weather
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 434 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 450 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |