MD HB835 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a refillable container permit in Washington County; authorizing the Washington County Board of License Commissioners to issue a refillable container permit to the holders of specified licenses for specified fees and subject to specified requirements; specifying permit fees; specifying that the hours of sale for the permit begin at the same time as those for the license already held by the person to whom the refillable container permit is issued; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Washington County - Refillable Container Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105 |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {683894/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Washington County
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Fees
Forms
Hearings
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Notices
Washington County