MD HB833 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a licensed respiratory care practitioner has the right to practice respiratory care within the scope of practice of the respiratory care practitioner's license, including in a sleep laboratory; and providing that the licensing requirements to practice polysomnography do not apply to a respiratory care practitioner who was licensed by the State Board of Physicians on or before December 31, 2012, and whose duties include practicing polysomnography.
Title
Respiratory Care Practitioners - Practicing Polysomnography - Licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |