MD HB830 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-22 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Community Development Administration from requiring the use of long-term tax-exempt bonds to qualify for Rental Housing Works loans or otherwise conditioning the award of financial assistance under an affordable housing program administered by the Administration on the use of any other Administration resource.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development Administration - Financial Assistance Programs - Prohibitions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-02-09HouseHearing canceled
2021-02-06HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Housing and Community Development4225(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback