MD HB830 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the governing body of a county that exercises its authority to establish a system of public campaign financing for elective offices in the executive and legislative branches of county government to provide the funding and staff necessary for the operation, administration, and auditing of the system of public campaign financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Public Campaign Financing – Administration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {395160/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-12HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback