MD HB83 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Maryland Judiciary Case Search from in any way referring to the existence of a District Court criminal case in which possession of marijuana is the only charge in the case and the charge was disposed of before October 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure – Charge of Possession of Marijuana – Removal From Case Search

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseVetoed by the Governor (Policy)
2020-03-17HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-13SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (115-16)
2020-03-10HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-10HouseFavorable with Amendments {972619/1 Adopted
2020-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2020-01-14HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB699 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure10111(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback