MD HB83 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing and revising provisions of law relating to trusts; providing that the Act may be cited as the Maryland Trust Act; providing for the scope of the Act; establishing whether a person has knowledge of a fact under the Act; establishing that a term of a trust prevails over specified other provisions of law, with specified exceptions; establishing that the common law of trusts and principles of equity supplement the Act, with a specified exception; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Trust Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585
2014-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2014-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2014-04-07SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Brinkley) {823428/1 Adopted
2014-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {748477/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2014-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-15HouseFloor Committee Amendment {393327/1 Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {912610/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2014-01-22HouseHearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2013-11-13HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0083&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0083f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0083t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0083e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_585_hb0083e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0083_39332701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0083_91261001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0083_74847701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0083_82342801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0083.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0083_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0083_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0083,h-0684&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0083,h-1333&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0083,s-1119&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback