MD HB83 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring health insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to reimburse an ambulance service provider directly for specified covered services under specified circumstances; providing that an insured, a subscriber, or an enrollee of specified health insurance carriers may not be liable to specified ambulance service providers for specified services under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Ambulance Service Providers - Direct Reimbursement
Sponsors
Del. Eric Bromwell [D] | Del. Robert Costa [R] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Donald Elliott [R] |
Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Peter Hammen [D] | Del. Kevin Kelly [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-04-11 | Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Finance | |
2011-04-04 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-04-09 | Returned Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Ambulances
Civil Actions
Debt Collection
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance Administration
Liability
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Civil Actions
Debt Collection
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance Administration
Liability
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset