MD HB829 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Capital Access Program in the Department of Commerce for the purpose of stimulating opportunities for small businesses that may have difficulty in obtaining business financing to have access to credit by establishing a loan loss reserve program; specifying that certain loans qualify under the Program; requiring a lender to enroll a qualifying loan not more than 30 days after the date of the first disbursement; authorizing a lender to enroll all or a portion of a qualifying loan in an amount not more than $250,000; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic Development – Small Business Financing – Loan Loss Reserve (Maryland Capital Access Program)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-04-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-04-12SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-03-19SenateReferred Finance Budget and Taxation
2021-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (111-27)
2021-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {373296/1 Adopted
2021-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2021-02-05HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-29HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Same As/Similar To

SB788 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Economic Development51701(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51702(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51703(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51704(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51705(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51706(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51707(n/a)See Bill Text
Economic Development51708(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback