MD HB829 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Delegates Arora, Valderrama, and Glass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that the medical professional responsible for the care of an inmate determine when the inmate's health allows the inmate to be returned to a correctional facility after giving birth; providing that it is the policy of the State that restraint of pregnant inmates during labor and delivery should not be used unless determined necessary by an attending medical professional or specified others; requiring the security officer of a correctional facility to make and maintain specified written findings; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Services - Pregnant Detainees and Inmates - Restraint Restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-3) (Y: 133 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-08HouseDelegates Arora, Valderrama, and Glass
2013-04-08HouseConference Committee Appointed
2013-04-08HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2013-04-08HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2013-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {768475/1 Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2013-04-02SenateHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2013-03-25HouseThird Reading Passed (133-3)
2013-03-23HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2013-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {622519/1 Report Adopted
2013-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2013-02-26HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0829?ys=2013rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0829f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/bills/hb/hb0829t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0829_62251901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2013RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0829_76847501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0829.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0829_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2013RS/votes_comm/hb0829_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0829,h-0729&stab=02&ys=2013RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0829,s-1160&stab=02&ys=2013RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback