MD HB826 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain provisions of a recorded covenant or restriction, a declaration, or the bylaws or rules of a condominium or homeowners association are void and unenforceable; requiring the governing body of a condominium or homeowners association to approve the installation of electric vehicle recharging equipment in a certain parking space under certain circumstances; requiring certain owners of electric vehicle recharging equipment to be responsible for certain costs and disclosures; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-10) (Y: 131 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (130-10)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {300115/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-11HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback