MD HB826 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering from 10 to 15 the number of days' advance notice the County Commissioners of Carroll County must give to an owner or occupant of property before removing a specified nuisance or menace; authorizing a property owner or occupant to file an appeal of a specified determination that a nuisance or menace exists to a specified hearing officer or board of appeals within 10 business days after receiving notice of the determination under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll County - Abatement of Nuisances

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-05 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2011-04-04 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-04 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-07 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-23 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-04-06 Returned Passed
2011-03-20 Third Reading Passed (139-0)
2011-03-18 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-18 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-03-17 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2011-02-24 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback