MD HB825 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB616
Note: Carry Over of previous HB414
Note: Carry Over of previous HB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments; repealing a requirement that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation hold a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to give certain notice of a member's right to request a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2021-03-03 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB825 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
HB414 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
HB414 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Assessments
Claims
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Hearings
Housing
Notices
Real Property
Time
Claims
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Hearings
Housing
Notices
Real Property
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 5 | 6B-30 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Corporations and Associations | 5 | 6B-31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |