MD HB825 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the annual salary of the State's Attorney for Anne Arundel County shall be specified amounts for specified calendar years; repealing a provision of law that requires a specified salary increase; providing that the State's Attorney may set specified salaries and compensation subject to the approval of the county council; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary or compensation of the incumbent State's attorney etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - State's Attorney and Deputy, Assistant, and Temporary Assistant State's Attorneys - Annual Salary and Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {190111/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
County Councils
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Salaries and Compensation
State's Attorneys
County Councils
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Salaries and Compensation
State's Attorneys