MD HB824 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalty for a violation of the prohibition on wearing, carrying, or transporting a handgun; requiring the State Commission on Criminal Sentencing Policy to annually report certain information to the Governor and General Assembly; requiring the Department of State Police to transmit a certain summary of certain laws relating to firearms to certain persons; requiring the Secretary of State Police, in consultation with the Attorney General and the Maryland Department of Health, to develop a certain curriculum; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Possession and Permits to Carry, Wear, and Transport a Handgun
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 873129/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Carter) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 713828/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment 713828/1 (Senator Carter) (Senator Hayes) Adopted (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 713828/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 343223/1 (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 323027/1 (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Floor Amendment 293926/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-14 - House - Floor Amendment 223227/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 96 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 873129/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 13 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Carter) Rejected (Y: 17 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 713828/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment 713828/1 (Senator Carter) (Senator Hayes) Adopted (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 713828/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted (Y: 27 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 343223/1 (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-07 - Senate - Floor Amendment 323027/1 (Senator West) Rejected (Y: 16 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Floor Amendment 293926/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-03-14 - House - Floor Amendment 223227/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (Y: 35 N: 96 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651 |
2023-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2023-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-40) |
2023-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (28-13) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {873129/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (13-27) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Carter) Rejected (17-26) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713828/1 (Senator Carter) Rejected (16-26) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Floor Amendment {713828/1 (Senator Carter) (Senator Hayes) Adopted (28-14) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Reconsider Special Order (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {713828/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted (27-16) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {343223/1 (Senator West) Rejected (16-26) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {323027/1 (Senator West) Rejected (16-26) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 4/10 (Senator West) Withdrawn |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment {193724/1 (Senator Carter) Withdrawn |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {203421/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 3:00 p.m. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-39) |
2023-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {293926/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (39-93) |
2023-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {293926/1 (Delegate Pippy) Withdrawn |
2023-03-14 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted |
2023-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {293926/1 (Delegate Pippy) |
2023-03-14 | House | Floor Amendment {223227/1 (Delegate Pippy) Rejected (35-96) |
2023-03-10 | House | Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Pippy) Adopted |
2023-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {353527/1 Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Court Orders
Criminal Background Investigations
Death
Demographics
Education
Fees
Guns
Injury
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Protection Orders
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Safety
State Police, Department of
Storage
Court Orders
Criminal Background Investigations
Death
Demographics
Education
Fees
Guns
Injury
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Protection Orders
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Safety
State Police, Department of
Storage
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 4 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 133 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 147 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |