MD HB822 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a limitation on claiming the income tax credit for eligible long-term care insurance premiums for more than 1 year with respect to the same insured individual; altering the amount of the credit from a one-time $500 credit to a maximum of $250 for taxable years beginning January 1, 2016, and January 1, 2017, and a maximum of $500 for the taxable year beginning January 1, 2018, and for each taxable year thereafter; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2015.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care Premiums
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |