MD HB821 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-09 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program in the Maryland Department of Labor for the purpose of providing grants to eligible employers for training programs attended by health care workers; and requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $1,000,000 for the Program.
Title
Career Pathways for Health Care Workers Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2022-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243728/1 Adopted |
2022-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB518 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 403
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Historical Matters
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Minorities
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Governor
Grants
Health
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Historical Matters
Job Training
Labor, Department of
Minorities
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
State Universities and Colleges
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1505 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |