MD HB821 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to receive a resident hunting license without submitting a certain application if the person has resided in the State for less than 1 year, held a valid hunting license in the person's previous state of residence for the previous 3 years, and pays a certain fee.
Title
Natural Resources – Hunting Licenses – New Residents
Sponsors
Del. April Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |