MD HB821 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a report, by December 31 each year, by the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to include the amount of carried interest on any assets of the system; and requiring the report due on December 31, 2019, to include information for fiscal years 2015 through 2019.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System – Carried Interest – Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {624263/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Data
Fees
General Assembly
Interest
Investments
Procurement
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement
Contracts
Data
Fees
General Assembly
Interest
Investments
Procurement
Reports
Retirement Systems
State Pensions and Retirement