MD HB820 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the placement and use of four devices that display a real-time posting of the speed at which a driver is traveling along each roadway on Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) in Montgomery County; requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to increase speed limit enforcement efforts and to collect data on speeding violations on Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) in Montgomery County; and requiring the Maryland Transportation Authority to report by December 31, 2024, on enforcement efforts and the data collected.
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Route 200 (Intercounty Connector) - Speed Limit Enforcement MC 8-23
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-23) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {953228/1 Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Equipment
Highways
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Recordings
Reports
studies
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Equipment
Highways
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Montgomery County
Recordings
Reports
studies
Sunset
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road