MD HB820 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing a requirement that rituximab be approved by the federal Food and Drug Administration to be subject to a requirement on certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for the treatment of certain pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorders - Modification of Coverage Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 321 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2022-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-03-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Diseases
Drugs
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Drugs
Health
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors