MD HB817 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of the Environment to maintain information on its Web site to educate the public about composting and to promote composting in the State; requiring the Department, in consultation with the Department of Agriculture and the Maryland Environmental Service, to study composting in the State, and to make a report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2013, including a summary of the laws and regulations governing composting; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environment - Composting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-10 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-06 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2011-04-05 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-05 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-08 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-28 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-24 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-04-07 Returned Passed
2011-03-21 Third Reading Passed (134-2)
2011-03-20 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-20 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-21 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2011-02-11 Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback