MD HB816 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $200,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Trustees of St. Luke's United Methodist Church for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore County - St. Luke's United Methodist Church Fellowship Hall
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-03-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Appropriations |