MD HB813 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency from allowing the establishment of any system or program that allows a person to purchase a State lottery ticket through an electronic device that connects to the Internet such as a personal computer or mobile device.
Title
State Lottery Tickets - Internet Sales - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-0) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Special Order until 9:30 pm (Senator Simonaire) Adopted |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-04-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Gaming
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations
Electronic Government
Gaming
Lottery
Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State
Rules and Regulations