MD HB813 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-10-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness; providing for the appointment of the members and cochairs of the Committee; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Committee to hold specified meetings; authorizing the Committee to hold specified hearings and consider specified votes on specified bills or resolutions; requiring specified reports to be submitted to the General Assembly on or before December 1 of each year; and providing for a delayed effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-3) (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-05HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427
2014-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (132-3)
2014-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
2014-03-31SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments {327276/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-31SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2014-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2014-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (133-2)
2014-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {646181/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-03-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-03HouseHearing cancelled
2014-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-19HouseHearing cancelled
2014-03-11HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0813?ys=2014rs
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0813f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0813t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0813e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_427_hb0813e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0813_64618101.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0813_32727601.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0813.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0813_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0813_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0813,h-0705&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0813,s-0817&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0813,h-1055&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback