MD HB813 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing in the part of the Gateway Arts and Entertainment District in the City of Hyattsville the use of the front door or main entrance in an establishment for which a specified alcoholic beverages license is issued if the door or entrance is at least 500 feet from a place of worship.
Title
Prince George's County - Hyattsville - Arts and Entertainment District -
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable with Amendments 653799/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Churches
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Churches
Municipal Corporations
Prince George's County