MD HB812 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 616
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a requirement that each county board of education develop and implement an automated external defibrillator program that meets specified requirements for high schools to include middle schools in the county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Middle Schools - Automated External Defibrillators

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 616
2014-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2014-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-04-02SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2014-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-13HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-12HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2014-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-03HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback