MD HB812 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adding dating violence to provisions of law requiring the reporting of bullying, harassment, and intimidation by a county board of education; specifying who may report incidents of dating violence; requiring that forms, reports, policies and educational programs include incidents of dating violence; altering to March 31, 2012, the date by which each county board must submit to the State Superintendent of Schools a model policy prohibiting bullying, dating violence, harassment, or intimidation in schools; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Dating Violence - Policy and Disciplinary Standards

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-07 Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-24 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-21 Third Reading Passed (133-5)
2011-03-20 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-20 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-21 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2011-02-16 Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-16 Hearing cancelled
2011-02-14 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback