MD HB810 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from selling a battery operated smoke alarm in the State for a certain purpose on or after October 1, 2018, unless the smoke alarm is a sealed, tamper resistant unit incorporating a silence/hush button and using one or more long-life batteries; and defining the term "long-life battery".
Title
Public Safety – Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-13) (Y: 121 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-13) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {710119/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |