MD HB81 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-9)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 666
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing "confinement" as a condition of disability for purposes of guardianship proceedings to protect a disabled individual's property; and repealing "confinement" as a condition of incapacity as defined under the Maryland Trust Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Estates and Trusts - Conditions of Disability and Incapacity - Confinement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 666
2017-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-07SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-13SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2017-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2017-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {666081/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-13HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0081?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0081f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0081t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_666_hb0081t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0081_66608101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0081.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0081_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0081_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0081,h-0357&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0081,s-1322&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback