MD HB808 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which a court may appoint a guardian of the person of a minor if the court finds, by a preponderance of the evidence that the appointment is in the best interests of the minor, no testamentary appointment has been made, no parent is willing or able to serve as the minor's guardian, each parent consents to the appointment, or no parent files an objection to the appointment; and providing that the appointment of a guardian of the person of a minor does not require the termination of parental rights.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of Minors - Appointment by Court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 619 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB508 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |