MD HB807 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an entity that conducts a continuing education course for real estate brokers, salespersons, and associate brokers to require an individual enrolled in a course to provide, to verify the individual's identity, a photo identification for an in-person course and a signed affidavit attesting to the identity of the individual for a virtual or other remote course.
Title
Real Estate Brokers, Salespersons, and Associate Brokers - Continuing Education Courses - Verification of Identity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 333 |
2022-04-01 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-01 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {903926/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2022-03-02 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Occupations and Professions
Continuing Education
Identification
Remote and Hybrid Education
Signatures
Virtual Environments
Continuing Education
Identification
Remote and Hybrid Education
Signatures
Virtual Environments
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |