MD HB807 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that, in addition to being licensed, an individual be certified under specified provisions of law and the Act before practicing optometry in the State within the scope of the certification; requiring specified optometrists to be certified under specified provisions of law before performing specified functions; altering the coursework requirements for specified certifications; establishing a new level of certification for licensed optometrists; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to interim study by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-21 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |