MD HB805 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adding Montgomery County to the list of counties that exempt agricultural buildings used for agritourism from the Maryland Building Performance Standards; and exempting a building used for agritourism in Montgomery County from a certain building permit requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990513/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Counties - Local Laws
Montgomery County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Tourism
Counties - Local Laws
Montgomery County
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Safety
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 12 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 12 | 508 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |