MD HB804 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-28 - Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Prince George's County Council to direct that voting by mail be utilized in specified special elections; applying specified provisions of law to a special election conducted by mail; requiring the local board of elections to mail a vote-by-mail ballot to each registered voter who is eligible to vote in a special election conducted by mail unless the voter has requested that the ballot be transmitted by other means; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Special Elections - Voting by Mail
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (107-29) | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments 435560/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Ballots
County Councils
Education, Boards of
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Notices
Postal Service
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Voting
County Councils
Education, Boards of
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Notices
Postal Service
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
Voting