MD HB803 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a business that winterizes boats from shrink wrapping a boat until all winterization procedures that require an employee to be inside the boat are complete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Business Regulation - Boat Winterization - Shrink Wrapping (Matthew's Law)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-01HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback