MD HB803 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an insurer from taking specified actions relating to life insurance coverage solely for reasons associated with an applicant's or insured's future lawful travel; establishing a specified exception related to bona fide differences in risk or exposure; and requiring an insurer to maintain specified data and documents that support the insurer's determination that bona fide differences in risk or exposure exist and to make the data and documents available on request from the Maryland Insurance Commissioner.
Title
Life Insurance - Freedom to Travel Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 123 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2016-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {936689/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-08 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Contracts
Disclosure
Discrimination
Health
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
International Affairs
Prices
Records
Safety
Transportation
Disclosure
Discrimination
Health
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
International Affairs
Prices
Records
Safety
Transportation