MD HB802 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to allow a person to hunt on each Sunday of the game bird and game mammal season in Calvert County.
Title
Calvert County - Sunday Hunting
Sponsors
Del. Jerry Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-9) |
2021-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {330119/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-02-19 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB802 (Carry Over) 2021-03-22 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB356 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
SB356 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 10 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |